Global Patent Index - EP 1185995 B1

EP 1185995 B1 2002-11-06 - ON/OFF CONTROL DEVICE ESPECIALLY FOR A DISCONNECTION DEVICE SUCH AS A CIRCUIT BREAKER AND CIRCUIT BREAKER FITTER WITH SAID DEVICE.

Title (en)

ON/OFF CONTROL DEVICE ESPECIALLY FOR A DISCONNECTION DEVICE SUCH AS A CIRCUIT BREAKER AND CIRCUIT BREAKER FITTER WITH SAID DEVICE.

Title (de)

STEUERVORRICHTUNG ZUM ÖFFNEN UND/ODER ZUM SCHLIESSEN, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN SCHALTGERÄT WIE EIN SCHUTZSCHALTER, UND EIN SCHUTZSCHALTER AUSGERÜSTET MIT DIESER VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'OUVERTURE ET/OU DE FERMETURE, EN PARTICULIER POUR UN APPAREIL DE COUPURE TEL UN DISJONCTEUR, ET DISJONCTEUR EQUIPE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1185995 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 00910944 A

Priority

  • FR 0000619 W
  • FR 9906592 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2793944A1] The command mechanism activates a circuit breaker. There is a permanent magnet and winding moving an armature from a rest position. The armature (9) is mounted rotating between two step positions (11,12) in a support section (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/38; H01H 33/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/38 (2006.01); H01H 33/42 (2006.01); H01H 33/666 (2006.01); H01H 51/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/6662 (2013.01); H01H 33/38 (2013.01); H01H 51/2263 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2793944 A1 20001124; FR 2793944 B1 20010713; AU 3297800 A 20001212; CN 1170296 C 20041006; CN 1350693 A 20020522; DE 60000739 D1 20021212; DE 60000739 T2 20030731; EA 003999 B1 20031225; EA 200101217 A1 20020425; EP 1185995 A1 20020313; EP 1185995 B1 20021106; ES 2184701 T3 20030416; JP 2003500816 A 20030107; JP 4326705 B2 20090909; US 6674349 B1 20040106; WO 0072347 A1 20001130

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040316

2005-03-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050315

2004-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-11-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040315

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040316

2004-03-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040315

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1185995E

2003-04-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20021106

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184701 T3

2003-03-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030328

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-03-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030303

- Year of fee payment: 4

2003-01-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000739 20021212

2002-11-27 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020416

2002-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI