Global Patent Index - EP 1186071 A4

EP 1186071 A4 2002-09-04 - DELAY LINE FILTER

Title (en)

DELAY LINE FILTER

Title (de)

VERZÖGERUNGSLEITUNGSFILTER

Title (fr)

FILTRE LIGNE A RETARD

Publication

EP 1186071 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00944661 A

Priority

  • US 0016257 W
  • US 13865199 P
  • US 14869099 P
  • US 19524600 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0101511A1] A delay circuit (28) configured to include a delay compensating circuit (29) coupled in series with an integrated filter circuit (30). The delay compensating circuit (29) comprises a miniaturized 3db quadrature hybrid coupler (40) having first, second, third, and fourth ports, and a first resonator (41) and a second resonator (46) formed from lumped elements, respectively coupled to the second and third ports; and the filter circuit (30) comprises a plurality of lumped elements coupled in series with the delay compensating circuit (29) to one of the first and second ports.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/205; H01P 9/00; H03F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/205 (2006.01); H01P 9/00 (2006.01); H03F 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 9/00 (2013.01); H01P 1/205 (2013.01); H03F 1/3229 (2013.01); H03F 2200/198 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [DY] US 3277403 A 19661004 - COHN SEYMOUR B
  • [Y] US 3768045 A 19731023 - CHUNG S
  • [A] US 5045821 A 19910903 - STAUDINGER JOSEPH [US], et al
  • [A] GB 2295928 A 19960612 - FUJITSU LTD [JP]
  • [A] MANTON R G: "HYBRID NETWORKS AND THEIR USES IN RADIO-FREQUENCY CIRCUITS", RADIO AND ELECTRONIC ENGINEER, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRONIC AND RADIO ENGINEERS. LONDON, GB, vol. 54, no. 11/12, 1 November 1984 (1984-11-01), pages 473 - 489, XP002032789, ISSN: 0033-7722
  • See also references of WO 0101511A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0101511 A1 20010104; WO 0101511 A9 20020613; AU 5872400 A 20010131; EP 1186071 A1 20020313; EP 1186071 A4 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-09-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020717

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011206

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI