Global Patent Index - EP 1186260 A3

EP 1186260 A3 2002-09-18 - Anatomical support

Title (en)

Anatomical support

Title (de)

Anatomische Stütze

Title (fr)

Support anatomique

Publication

EP 1186260 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00670003 A

Priority

PT 10230899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1186260A2] The invention concerns to the conception of an anatomical pillow manufactured in polyurethane and covered by a white colour cotton tissue. Its surface is formed by wavy grooves ( 1 ) and its lateral, posterior and inferior sides are smooth (2, 3, 4 ). In its surface, emerges a relief ( 5 ) that makes possible to its user, when in a vertical position ( figure 1 ), to lay suitably and uniformly his lombar region and in an horizontal position ( figure 2 ) to support suitably and uniformly the cervical column zone. This pillow permits to avoid the discomfort caused by common pillows, mainly when used by people who must lie in bed. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 20/02; A47C 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/00 (2006.01); A47C 20/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 20/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1186260 A2 20020313; EP 1186260 A3 20020918; PT 102308 A 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-07-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT PT

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 20/02 A, 7A 47C 9/10 B

2002-06-21 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI