Global Patent Index - EP 1186690 A3

EP 1186690 A3 2002-09-25 - Integrated spindle and motor rotor

Title (en)

Integrated spindle and motor rotor

Title (de)

Intergrieter Spindel und Motorrotor

Title (fr)

Broche et rotor de moteur intérgré

Publication

EP 1186690 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01203201 A

Priority

IT MI20001958 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1186690A2] A single-motor spindle or motor spindle (20) for textile machines, comprising a synchronous motor, fed by an individual three-phase generator with variable voltage and frequency, wherein the design of the spindle (20) and of the actuation motor are conceived as a single entity and the support part, comprising the bearings and dampers (10, 12), is foreseen in the lower part of the motor spindle (20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/244; D01H 7/88

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/244 (2006.01); D01H 7/04 (2006.01); D01H 7/88 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/244 (2013.01); D01H 7/048 (2013.01); D01H 7/88 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1186690 A2 20020313; EP 1186690 A3 20020925; EP 1186690 B1 20050727; DE 60112198 D1 20050901; IT 1318824 B1 20030910; IT MI20001958 A1 20020306; IT MI20001958 D0 20000906

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050831

2006-09-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-09-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-07-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60112198 P 20050901

2005-07-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2005-07-27 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2005-07-27 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050727

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040213

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 01H 1/244 A, 7D 01H 7/88 B

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI