Global Patent Index - EP 1186700 A3

EP 1186700 A3 2002-11-20 - Process for replacing an intermediate roll in a calender and calender

Title (en)

Process for replacing an intermediate roll in a calender and calender

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Austauschen einer Zwischenwalze in einem Kalander und Kalander

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le remplacement d' un rouleau intermédiaire dans un calandre et calandre

Publication

EP 1186700 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01118475 A

Priority

DE 10041887 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10041887C1] To exchange an intermediate calender roller, in a calendar roller assembly with more than three rollers with a press plane pitched at a given angle to vertical, at least the rollers below the intermediate roller are lowered. The lower roller immediately under the intermediate roller forms a gap for maneuver and is lowered by an additional value expressed as: h=(r1?+r2)(1?-cos alpha ) where r1 is the radius of the intermediate roller, r2 the radius of the neighboring roller, and alpha is the angle. At the same time, the neighboring roller is given a side movement (s) expressed as: s=h\*tan alpha . The gaps between the rollers below the intermediate roller are set at 8-15 mm according to the maneuver gap. The rollers under the intermediate roller are moved on the press plane. The limit stops for the lower rollers are adjusted to select the intermediate roller, using nuts on spindles for the adjustment. An Independent claim is included for a calender roller assembly, with rollers (9-12) under an intermediate roller (8) for exchange, aligned on an angled press plane, to be lowered parallel to the press plane (P) for an intermediate roller (8) exchange. Preferred Features: The rollers (5-12) are mounted on levers with the possible exception of a top and bottom roller (3). The levers pivot on columns (2), with an adjustable limit stop for each lever. The limit stops are formed by nuts and spindles. A control unit operates an adjustment mechanism to set the limit stops.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/002 (2013.01); D21G 1/0293 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49545 (2013.01); Y10T 29/4973 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49815 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 10041887 C1 20010920; CA 2355983 A1 20020225; CA 2355983 C 20050607; DE 50108369 D1 20060119; EP 1186700 A2 20020313; EP 1186700 A3 20021120; EP 1186700 B1 20051214; US 2002043354 A1 20020418; US 6651337 B2 20031125

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-11-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060915

2006-09-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2006-08-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060802

2006-08-01 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-03-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50108369 P 20060119

2005-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050201

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 21G 1/02 A

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI