Global Patent Index - EP 1186763 B1

EP 1186763 B1 2004-12-15 - Throttle valve body

Title (en)

Throttle valve body

Title (de)

Drosselklappenstutzen

Title (fr)

Corps de papillon

Publication

EP 1186763 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01121149 A

Priority

DE 10044294 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1186763A2] The socket (10) has a tubular socket part (16) with an outer jacket (16A) of metal, which is at least partially and radially enclosed by a plastic housing (12). The housing contains an adjusting drive (30) for the throttle flap shaft (22). The housing also contains a position detection unit (32) and a spring system for the throttle flap shaft. The socket part has radial projections (44) for shaft bearings (46). The adjusting drive has a metal base plate (36).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/14 (2006.01); F02D 9/00 (2006.01); F02D 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 9/10 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 35/00 (2006.01); B29K 105/22 (2006.01); B29L 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/104 (2013.01); F02D 9/1035 (2013.01); F02D 9/107 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01); Y10T 137/8242 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1186763 A2 20020313; EP 1186763 A3 20030402; EP 1186763 B1 20041215; DE 10044294 A1 20020516; JP 2002138861 A 20020517; US 2002056478 A1 20020516; US 6505643 B2 20030114

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50104816

- Effective date: 20140401

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121010

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100904

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090904

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090904

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090926

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050211

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104816 P 20050120

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI