EP 1186961 A1 20020313 - Flexible packaging material having a print on it
Title (en)
Flexible packaging material having a print on it
Title (de)
Flexibles Verpackungsmaterial mit einer Bedruckung
Title (fr)
Matériau d' emballage portant une impression
Publication
Application
Priority
EP 00810807 A 20000907
Abstract (en)
Flexible packaging material (10) consists of a monofoil or a foil compound (11) with surface printing (12) on one or both sides. The packaging material contains a partially or fully transparent, heat-resistant protective layer (13) applied to the printed surface by means of an electrophotographic process. The protective layer is created from a toner that cures through ultraviolet or electron irradiation.
Abstract (de)
Ein flexibles Verpackungsmaterial (10), insbesondere ein siegel und/oder sterilisierbares Verpackungsmaterial, besteht aus einer Monofolie oder einem Folienverbund (11) mit einer ein- oder beidseitigen Bedruckung (12), wobei das Verpackungsmaterial eine mittels eines elektrophotographischen Verfahrens wenigstens auf die Bedruckung aufgebrachte teilweise oder vollständig transparente, hitzebeständige Überzugsschicht (13) enthält und die Überzugsschicht aus einem durch Ultraviolett- oder Elektronenstrahlung härtenden Toner erzeugt ist. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
CPC (source: EP US)
G03G 8/00 (2013.01 - EP US); G03G 9/0926 (2013.01 - EP US); Y10T 428/24802 (2015.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199834, Derwent World Patents Index; Class B07, AN 1998-391386, XP002158537
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 11 29 November 1996 (1996-11-29)
- [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199345, Derwent World Patents Index; Class F05, AN 1993-357665, XP002158538
- [A] DATABASE WPI Section PQ Week 199926, Derwent World Patents Index; Class P74, AN 1999-307061, XP002158539
- [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199713, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A97, AN 1997-136577, XP002158540
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 076 16 February 1993 (1993-02-16)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 278 1 August 1988 (1988-08-01)
- [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199636, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A12, AN 1996-359625, XP002158541
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1186961 A1 20020313; AU 1219302 A 20020322; CA 2421497 A1 20030304; CA 2421497 C 20060502; US 2003186032 A1 20031002; US 2005233240 A1 20051020; WO 0221220 A1 20020314; WO 0221220 A9 20020704
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 00810807 A 20000907; AU 1219302 A 20010903; CA 2421497 A 20010903; EP 0110123 W 20010903; US 15963905 A 20050623; US 36387903 A 20030307