Global Patent Index - EP 1187253 A4

EP 1187253 A4 2002-11-20 - MULTI-FREQUENCY ANTENNA

Title (en)

MULTI-FREQUENCY ANTENNA

Title (de)

MEHRFREQUENZANTENNE

Title (fr)

ANTENNE MULTIFREQUENCE

Publication

EP 1187253 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 01906261 A

Priority

  • JP 0101362 W
  • JP 2000076164 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0171847A1] A D net antenna is divided into two and one is provided, as a D net element (13), in an antenna element (1) while the other element is contained, as a lower element (10), in a cover section (2). An E net element (11) is connected to the upper end of the lower element (10). The E net element (11) has a rectangular radiation surface and thereby has substantial nondirectionality in the horizontal plane. The antenna element (1) is fixed removably to the cover section (2), so that the D net element (13) is connected with the lower element (10), thus providing a multi-frequency antenna operating over two wide frequency bands.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/32; H01Q 1/22; H01Q 1/24; H01Q 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/22 (2006.01); H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 5/10 (2015.01); H01Q 5/321 (2015.01); H01Q 5/357 (2015.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 9/32 (2006.01); H01Q 9/40 (2006.01); H01Q 21/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/30 (2013.01); H01Q 1/3275 (2013.01); H01Q 5/371 (2013.01); H01Q 9/0407 (2013.01); H01Q 9/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0862239 A1 19980902 - NIPPON ANTENA KABUSHIKI KAISYA [JP]
  • [A] EP 0637093 A1 19950201 - NIPPON ANTENNA KK [JP]
  • [A] EKIKOFER V: "KOMBIANTENNE - EINE FUER ALLES. IMMER MEHR ANWENDUNGEN ERFORDERN IMMER MEHR ANTENNEN AUF DEM AUTODACH. DIE LOESUNG FUER DIESE VIELFALT SIND KOMBIANTENNEN, DENN SIE KOENNEN DIE VERSCHIEDENEN SIGNALE AUFFANGEN", FUNKSCHAU, FRANZIS-VERLAG K.G. MUNCHEN, DE, vol. 71, no. 8, 3 April 1998 (1998-04-03), pages 68 - 71, XP000779243, ISSN: 0016-2841
  • See also references of WO 0171847A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0171847 A1 20010927; DE 60100492 D1 20030828; DE 60100492 T2 20040219; EP 1187253 A1 20020313; EP 1187253 A4 20021120; EP 1187253 B1 20030723; JP 2001267831 A 20010928; JP 3464639 B2 20031110

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070223

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060223

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-02-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060223

2005-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050330

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-02-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050221

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-11-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2003-12-29 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60100492 P 20030828

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-20 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021007

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01Q 1/32 A, 7H 01Q 5/00 B, 7H 01Q 1/24 B, 7H 01Q 1/22 B

2002-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020104

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI