Global Patent Index - EP 1188406 A3

EP 1188406 A3 2002-11-20 - Mop

Title (en)

Mop

Title (de)

Wischer

Title (fr)

Balai à laver

Publication

EP 1188406 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01122228 A

Priority

DE 20016042 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1188406A2] The shaft (2) is connected to the center of the head of the mop (1). It is hinged (12) to a bracket (13) fastened to a crossbeam (8) on the rectangular mop head. The mop head may have hinges or flexures and an operating system to allow it to be folded into an inverted U-shape to squeeze the soft absorbent layer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 13/258; A47L 13/146

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/146 (2006.01); A47L 13/258 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 13/258 (2013.01); A47L 13/146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1188406 A2 20020320; EP 1188406 A3 20021120; EP 1188406 B1 20040414; AT 264083 T 20040415; DE 20016042 U1 20020221; DK 1188406 T3 20040517; ES 2217071 T3 20041101; PT 1188406 E 20040831; TR 200400863 T4 20040521

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170920

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-09-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-09-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FREUDENBERG HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE KG

- Free text: FREUDENBERG HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE KG#MALLAUSTRASSE 72#68219 MANNHEIM (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FREUDENBERG HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE KG#MALLAUSTRASSE 72#68219 MANNHEIM (DE)

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060917

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *FREUDENBERG HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE K.G.MALLAUSTRASSE 7

- Effective date: 20061214

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *FREUDENBERG HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE K.G.

- Effective date: 20061214

2007-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *FREUDENBERG HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE K.G.

- Effective date: 20061214

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-05-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-05-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-04-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-04-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070319

2007-04-13 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-04-13 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-03-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070319

2007-03-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2007-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: FREUDENBERG HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE KG

- Effective date: 20061208

2007-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: EMSA GMBH

2007-02-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: EMSA HOLDING GMBH

2006-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: EMSA GMBH

- Free text: EMSA HOLDING GMBH#GREVENER DAMM 215-225#48282 EMSDETTEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- EMSA GMBH#GREVENER DAMM 215-225#48282 EMSDETTEN (DE)

2006-12-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: EMSA HOLDING GMBH

- Free text: EMSA-WERKE WULF GMBH & CO. KG#GREVENER DAMM 215-225#48282 EMSDETTEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- EMSA HOLDING GMBH#GREVENER DAMM 215-225#48282 EMSDETTEN (DE)

2006-12-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: FREUDENBERG HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE KG

- Free text: EMSA GMBH#GREVENER DAMM 215-225#48282 EMSDETTEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FREUDENBERG HAUSHALTSPRODUKTE KG#MALLAUSTRASSE 72#68219 MANNHEIM (DE)

2006-10-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060930

2006-09-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060918

2006-09-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060917

2006-09-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060917

2005-09-23 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-09-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-09-22 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050922

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-09-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050919

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-08-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20050831

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-08-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050830

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-08-30 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20050830

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-08-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050830

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-12-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217071 T3

2004-09-17 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20040917

- Year of fee payment: 4

2004-08-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-07-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040401977

2004-06-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-05-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50101965 P 20040519

2004-05-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-05-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030505

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI