Global Patent Index - EP 1188471 A3

EP 1188471 A3 2002-09-25 - Low void adsorption system

Title (en)

Low void adsorption system

Title (de)

Adsorptionssystem mit geringem Leervolumen

Title (fr)

Système d'adsorption avec volume vide faible

Publication

EP 1188471 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01122214 A

Priority

US 66439000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1188471A2] A low void pressure swing adsorption system wherein flow movement and pressure pulse are influenced from the same source comprised of at least one hermetically sealed vessel containing an adsorbent bed with an inlet coupled to the adsorbent bed by way of an inlet header and an outlet coupled to the adsorbent bed by way of an outlet header. Void volume of the inlet and outlet headers can be limited to less than 20% of the adsorbent bed volume, preferably to less than 10%, and most preferably to less than 5%, by mounting high pressure source(s) and/or low pressure sink(s) proximate to, or nearly proximate to, the adsorbent bed/vessel. Low void volumes and reduced cycle times may be achieved in all bed configurations, including flat header beds, segmented beds, and vertical beds. Radial beds may be configured so that the void volume of the inlet and outlet headers is less than 50% of the volume of the radial adsorbent bed, preferably to less than 20%, and most preferably to less than 10%. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 53/047; B01D 53/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/04 (2006.01); B01D 53/047 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/0431 (2013.01); B01D 53/0446 (2013.01); B01D 53/047 (2013.01); B01D 2253/1085 (2013.01); B01D 2256/12 (2013.01); B01D 2257/102 (2013.01); B01D 2259/40037 (2013.01); B01D 2259/40066 (2013.01); B01D 2259/402 (2013.01); B01D 2259/4533 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1188471 A2 20020320; EP 1188471 A3 20020925; BR 0105885 A 20020611; CA 2357356 A1 20020318; CA 2357356 C 20051122; CN 1231282 C 20051214; CN 1347748 A 20020508; JP 2002143630 A 20020521; KR 100515209 B1 20050916; KR 20020022022 A 20020323; US 7122073 B1 20061017

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-09 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080214

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI