Global Patent Index - EP 1188613 B1

EP 1188613 B1 2003-06-25 - Loading tailgate

Title (en)

Loading tailgate

Title (de)

Hubladebühne

Title (fr)

Hayon élévateur

Publication

EP 1188613 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00120452 A

Priority

EP 00120452 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1188613A1] The platform (1) has at least one parallelogram-form lifting and angling carrier unit (2) for the platform (3). The lower connecting rod (6) is pivoted to a fixing element (4) on the carrier unit and to the platform. Each fixing element has several pre-formed fixing positions (11, 14, 15) so that the carrier unit can be attached to different parallelograms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60P 1/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60P 1/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60P 1/4485 (2013.01); B60P 1/4414 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1188613 A1 20020320; EP 1188613 B1 20030625; DE 50002660 D1 20030731

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002660

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050919

2005-09-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-09-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050919

2004-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040831

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002660 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010525

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI