Global Patent Index - EP 1188679 B1

EP 1188679 B1 2004-12-22 - Automatic closure for an elastic deformable container

Title (en)

Automatic closure for an elastic deformable container

Title (de)

Selbsttätiger Verschluss für elastisch verformbare Behälter

Title (fr)

Fermeture automatique pour récipient élastique déformable

Publication

EP 1188679 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01116423 A

Priority

DE 20013287 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: JP2002053153A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To achieve the suction system air feeding action required for a container by means of a valve inexpensive and simple even in respects of manufacture and assembly in the case where a return force of an elastic container wall is weak, and, simultaneously, permit no medium in the container or no medium in the easing of a closing mechanism to come into a pouring chamber or into air feed passages irrespective of any circumstances. SOLUTION: An inner ring wall is surrounded by a second ring wall forming one annular groove in cooperation with the inner ring wall, and the annular groove has at least one air feed orifice in an axial direction, which connects air feed passages 28, 29 to a hollow chamber 27 encircled by the second ring wall. Further, a cylindrical wall division of a hood-like hollow body, is provided with an elastic lip which has a function of an one-way valve to block the air feed orifice from the hollow chamber 27.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 35/50 (2006.01); B65D 47/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 35/20 (2013.01); B65D 47/2068 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 20013287 U1 20010111; AR 034133 A1 20040204; BR 0103165 A 20020402; BR 0103165 B1 20111116; CN 1197742 C 20050420; CN 1336313 A 20020220; EP 1188679 A2 20020320; EP 1188679 A3 20030702; EP 1188679 B1 20041222; ES 2230216 T3 20050501; HK 1045289 A1 20050812; JP 2002053153 A 20020219; JP 4588939 B2 20101201; MX PA01007691 A 20040811; TW 568869 B 20040101; US 2002030069 A1 20020314; US 6386404 B1 20020514

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50104867

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI CARTAGENA PARTNERSCHAFTSG, DE

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170608

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170713

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170801

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230216 T3

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104867 P 20050127

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI