Global Patent Index - EP 1188849 A3

EP 1188849 A3 2002-11-06 - Method of controlling single spindle driving motors of a spinning machine

Title (en)

Method of controlling single spindle driving motors of a spinning machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Steuerung von Einzelspindel-antriebsmotoren in Spinnmaschinen

Title (fr)

Méthode pour commander des moteurs d'entraînement des broches individuelles dans un métier à filer

Publication

EP 1188849 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01121715 A

Priority

JP 2000281704 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1188849A2] In a spinning machine for independently driving each spindle (5) by an individual motor (6), a synchronization motor is used as the motor and is controlled through an inverter (14). At least when a bobbin is pulled out after a doffing stop, each of the motors is supplied with a direct current (D3), and a holding force for holding the spindle in a stop state is increased. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/244; D01H 7/22; D01H 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/244 (2006.01); D01H 7/22 (2006.01); D01H 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/14 (2013.01); D01H 1/244 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1188849 A2 20020320; EP 1188849 A3 20021106; EP 1188849 B1 20060329; CN 100415966 C 20080903; CN 1343802 A 20020410; DE 60118282 D1 20060518; DE 60118282 T2 20061207; JP 2002088593 A 20020327; JP 3591438 B2 20041117

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090917

2011-01-05 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20100415

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-05-26 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20061221

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081016

- Year of fee payment: 8

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081002

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-10-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20061221

2007-02-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20061221

2006-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: NOVAGRAAF INTERNATIONAL SA

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60118282 P 20060518

2006-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030520

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 01H 1/244 A, 7D 01H 9/14 B, 7D 01H 7/22 B

2002-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010917

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI