Global Patent Index - EP 1188850 A3

EP 1188850 A3 2002-09-25 - Open-end spinning device

Title (en)

Open-end spinning device

Title (de)

Offenend-Spinnvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Métiers à filer à bout libre

Publication

EP 1188850 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01118193 A

Priority

  • DE 10045918 A
  • DE 10129132 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1188850A2] The open-end spinner has a sliver loosening unit (4) in an easily-released mounting at the connecting bracket (30) of its straight guide (3), at the spinning box housing (2). A sliver loosening roller (12), to break the sliver down into fibers, is within the sliver loosening unit with its own motor together with the sliver take-in cylinder (14) powered by a step motor (15). The sliver loosening unit is mounted to pivot on a swing axis in a guide slit at the mounting bracket, which is open to the front, held in place by a sprung locking bolt which slides within a drilling at the sliver loosening unit body. A second straight guide (70) is at the mounting bracket, with guide bolts (63) which fit into guide drillings (69) at the mounting body (71) of the sliver loosening unit. At least one guide bolt has a locking groove (66), to be engaged by manual locking levers (64) riding in vertical guide slits (65) near the guide drillings at the mounting body. A spring at the locking lever holds it in the engaged position. An electromotor (13) with an outer rotor drives the sliver loosening roller. A coupling plate (34) links the power supply lines (35-38) at the mounting bracket, working with a coupling (45) at the sliver loosening unit. A centering unit (46) is between the mounting bracket and the bearing pedestal (26) at the bearing assembly (5) for the spinning rotor, with at least one centering component (47) as a key holder. A static funnel (39) to catch dirt, and its pneumatic waste disposal system (40), are located under the sliver loosening unit. The spinning rotor (7) is powered by a single electromotor drive (6). The axis (48) of the sliver loosening roller and the axis (49) of the sliver take-in roller are orthogonal to the axis (50) of the spinning rotor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/08; D01H 1/16; D01H 4/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/08 (2006.01); D01H 1/16 (2006.01); D01H 4/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/16 (2013.01); D01H 4/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1188850 A2 20020320; EP 1188850 A3 20020925; CZ 20013299 A3 20020417; US 2002033013 A1 20020321; US 6668536 B2 20031230

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040803

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2003-06-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI