Global Patent Index - EP 1188868 A3

EP 1188868 A3 2002-11-27 - Element with connections for water supply and drain pipes of sanitary ware

Title (en)

Element with connections for water supply and drain pipes of sanitary ware

Title (de)

Verbindungselement für Wasserzufuhr- und Abwasserleitungen von Sanitärgegenständen

Title (fr)

Elément de connexion pour conduits d'eau et d'évacuation d'articles sanitaires

Publication

EP 1188868 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01119804 A

Priority

  • IT PD20000220 A
  • IT PD20010086 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1188868A2] The invention is a new, ready-to-use element in one piece or assembled, preferably made of plastic or metal, to which the terminal sections of the water supply and waste water drain pipes of sanitaryware are applied, in order to facilitate the correct laying of the pipes and of the connections. The element comprises two or three U-shaped channels parallel to one another and some cross elements that join the U-shaped channels, wherein the width of the lateral U-shaped channels is such as to allow two water supply pipes to be housed therein and the width of the central U-shaped channel, if provided, is such as to allow a waste water drain pipe to be housed therein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/32 (2006.01); E03D 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/32 (2013.01); E03D 11/143 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1188868 A2 20020320; EP 1188868 A3 20021127

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060902

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030714

2003-08-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030503

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI