Global Patent Index - EP 1188909 A3

EP 1188909 A3 2003-06-04 - Internal combustion engine exhaust device

Title (en)

Internal combustion engine exhaust device

Title (de)

Abgasvorrichtung für Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour gaz d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1188909 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01122095 A

Priority

IT BO20000535 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1188909A2] An exhaust device (1) for internal combustion engines (2), having a main catalyst (3), an auxiliary catalyst (4), and an exhaust manifold (5) connecting the input of the main catalyst (3) to the exhaust outlets of the internal combustion engine (2), so as to feed the exhaust gases from the exhaust outlets to the main catalyst (3); the exhaust manifold (5) assuming a first operating configuration connecting the input of the main catalyst (3) to the output of the auxiliary catalyst (4), and the input of the auxiliary catalyst (4) to the internal combustion engine (2), and a second operating configuration connecting the input of the main catalyst (3) directly to the internal combustion engine (2) and excluding the auxiliary catalyst (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/20 (2006.01); F01N 13/02 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/2053 (2013.01); F01N 13/009 (2014.06); F01N 2410/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1188909 A2 20020320; EP 1188909 A3 20030604; IT BO20000535 A1 20020315; IT BO20000535 D0 20000915; US 2002062642 A1 20020530

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2004-01-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI