Global Patent Index - EP 1188923 A3

EP 1188923 A3 2003-06-18 - Coating for a swash plate of a swash plate compressor

Title (en)

Coating for a swash plate of a swash plate compressor

Title (de)

Beschichtung einer Schrägscheibe eines Kompressors

Title (fr)

Revêtement d'un plateau-came d'un compresseur

Publication

EP 1188923 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01122238 A

Priority

JP 2000281698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1188923A2] A swash plate type compressor that has a pair of shoes (18A, 18B, 18C, 18D, 18E) between a swash plate (15) and a piston (17). The motion of the swash plate is transmitted to the piston through the shoes. Each piston reciprocates according to the transmitted motion. A coating (32, 33) is applied to each surface of the swash plate to contact the corresponding shoe. The surface (H) of each coating (32, 33) is flat. Each shoe (18A to 18E) includes a substantially flat surface (34), which contacts the swash plate (15), and a semi-spherical portion (35), which is fitted to the piston (17). Each substantially flat surface (34) includes a main chamfered portion (342) near the periphery. The inclination angle (θ 1) of each main chamfered portion (342) with respect to the corresponding coating is a predetermined angle or less. Each coating contacts one of the substantially flat surfaces (34). The maximum distance ( beta ) between each main chamfered portion (342) and the corresponding coating is equal to or less than the thickness (D) of the corresponding coating (32, 33). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 27/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/10 (2006.01); F04B 27/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 27/0886 (2013.01); F05C 2251/14 (2013.01); F05C 2253/12 (2013.01); F05C 2253/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1188923 A2 20020320; EP 1188923 A3 20030618; EP 1188923 B1 20040616; BR 0104725 A 20020604; CN 1138068 C 20040211; CN 1344863 A 20020417; DE 60103826 D1 20040722; DE 60103826 T2 20050714; JP 2002089438 A 20020327; JP 4292700 B2 20090708; KR 100441354 B1 20040723; KR 20020021979 A 20020323; US 2002155004 A1 20021024

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60103826

- Effective date: 20140401

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120912

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070917

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050823

- Year of fee payment: 5

2005-06-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60103826 P 20040722

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-03-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010917

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI