Global Patent Index - EP 1189172 A9

EP 1189172 A9 2002-09-04 - Method and apparatus for direct and indirect texture processing in a graphics system

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for direct and indirect texture processing in a graphics system

Title (de)

Methode und Vorrichtung für direkte und indirekte Texturverarbeitung in einem Graphiksystem

Title (fr)

Procede et appareil de mappage de texture directe et indirecte dans un système graphique

Publication

EP 1189172 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 01307189 A

Priority

  • US 22689100 P
  • US 72238200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1189172A2] In a system for rendering 3D graphics, an efficient texturing pipeline arrangement (Fig. 8) achieves a relatively low chip-footprint by utilizing a single texture coordinate/data processing unit (Fig. 14) that interleaves the processing of logical direct (7006) and indirect (7004) texture coordinate data. A texture lookup data feedback path (7018) is provided for "recirculating" indirect texture lookup data retrieved from a single texture retrieval unit (7012) back to the texture coordinate/data processing unit (7002-7014). Versatile indirect texture referencing is achieved by using the same texture coordinate/data processing unit to transform the recirculated texture lookup data into offsets that may be added to the texture coordinates of a direct texture lookup. A generalized indirect texture API function is provided that supports defining at least four indirect texture referencing operations and allows for selectively associating one of at least eight different texture images with each indirect texture defined. Retrieved indirect texture lookup data is processed as multi-bit binary data triplets of three, four, five, or eight bits. The data triplets are multiplied by a 3 X 2 texture coordinate offset matrix before being optionally combined with regular non-indirect coordinate data or coordinate data from a previous cycle/stage of processing. Values of the offset matrix elements are variable and may be dynamically defined for each cycle/stage using selected constants. Two additional variable matrix configurations are also defined containing element values obtained from current direct texture coordinates. Circuitry for optionally biasing and scaling retrieved texture data is also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06T 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06T 15/00 (2011.01); G06T 15/04 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06T 15/04 (2013.01); G06T 15/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1189172 A2 20020320; EP 1189172 A3 20140128; EP 1189172 A9 20020904; JP 2002063593 A 20020228; JP 2011065677 A 20110331; JP 4678963 B2 20110427; JP 4890638 B2 20120307; US 2005237337 A1 20051027; US 7002591 B1 20060221; US 7307638 B2 20071211

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040729

2004-11-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-09-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEATHER, MARK M.

2002-09-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DREBIN, ROBERT A.

2002-09-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAN HOOK, TIMOTHY J.

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI