Global Patent Index - EP 1189768 A4

EP 1189768 A4 2003-06-25 - TYRE CLAMPED TO WHEEL RIM

Title (en)

TYRE CLAMPED TO WHEEL RIM

Title (de)

AUF EINER FELGE FESTGEKLEMMTER REIFEN

Title (fr)

BANDAGE SERRE SUR LA JANTE D'UNE ROUE

Publication

EP 1189768 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00934812 A

Priority

  • AU 0000653 W
  • AU PQ087199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0076789A1] To secure non-pneumatic tyre (10), radially inner portion (31) thereof is radially contracted onto wheel rim (13). Inner portion (31) may comprise channelled flanges (51-52) on opposed sides of tyre (10). Rings (61) are seated in the channels of flanges (51-52). Segments (63) of the rings (61) are joined at bolted connections (70) allowing contraction of rings (61) and thereby clamping of tyre (10) to rim (13). Alternatively the inner portion of the tyre may have vulcanised thereto a broad metal band formed in segments. Gaps between the segments may be drawn together using bolts, or wedges may be used, to clamp the tyre to the wheel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60C 7/28; B60C 7/26; B60C 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 7/26 (2006.01); B60C 7/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60C 7/28 (2013.01); B60C 7/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0076789 A1 20001221; AU PQ087199 A0 19990701; EP 1189768 A1 20020327; EP 1189768 A4 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031016

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CROCODILE CORPORATION LTD.

2003-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CROCODILE CORPORATION LTD.

2003-06-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030513

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60C 7/28 A

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60C 7/26 B

2003-06-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 60C 15/02 B

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020108

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI