Global Patent Index - EP 1189944 A4

EP 1189944 A4 2002-09-11 - AXOR16, A G PROTEIN COUPLED RECEPTOR

Title (en)

AXOR16, A G PROTEIN COUPLED RECEPTOR

Title (de)

G-PROTEIN GEKOPPELTER REZEPTOR AXOR16

Title (fr)

AXOR16, R CEPTEUR COUPL UNE PROT INE G

Publication

EP 1189944 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00942952 A

Priority

  • US 0016869 W
  • US 33710599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0078809A1] The AXOR16 polypeptides and polynucleotides and methods for producing such polypeptides by recombinant techniques are disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for utilizing AXOR16 polypeptides and polynucleotides in diagnostic assays.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/705; C07K 16/28; C12N 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] WO 0011015 A1 20000302 - ALPHAGENE INC [US]
  • [PX] WO 0022131 A2 20000420 - WHITE CAROL [US]
  • [PX] WO 0031258 A2 20000602 - ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al
  • [A] ARVIDSSON ANN-KRISTIN ET AL: "Cloning of a neuropeptide Y/peptide YY receptor from the Atlantic cod: The Yb receptor.", REGULATORY PEPTIDES, vol. 75-76, 1997, pages 39 - 43, XP002203031, ISSN: 0167-0115
  • See also references of WO 0078809A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0078809 A1 20001228; EP 1189944 A1 20020327; EP 1189944 A4 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): GB

2004-01-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031013

2002-09-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ELSHOURBAGY, NABIL

2002-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHABON, USMAN

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011221

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE