EP 1190448 A4 20041124 - CHIP PACKAGE WITH MOLDED UNDERFILL
Title (en)
CHIP PACKAGE WITH MOLDED UNDERFILL
Title (de)
CHIP-GEHÄUSE MIT SPRITZGEGOSSENER UNTERFÜLLUNG
Title (fr)
BOITIER DE MICROCIRCUIT A COMBLEMENT MOULE
Publication
Application
Priority
US 9910771 W 19990514
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
H01L 21/56 (2006.01); H01L 21/60 (2006.01); H01L 23/28 (2006.01); H01L 23/29 (2006.01); H01L 23/31 (2006.01); H01L 23/48 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR)
H01L 23/16 (2013.01 - KR); H01L 2224/32225 (2013.01 - EP); H01L 2924/14 (2013.01 - EP); H01L 2924/15151 (2013.01 - EP); H01L 2924/15311 (2013.01 - EP)
Citation (search report)
- [XA] WO 9900834 A2 19990107 - IBM [US], et al
- [A] US 5557150 A 19960917 - VARIOT PATRICK [US], et al
- [A] US 5578261 A 19961126 - MANZIONE LOUIS T [US], et al
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 11 26 December 1995 (1995-12-26)
- [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 06 30 April 1998 (1998-04-30) & US 6107689 A 20000822 - KOZONO HIROYUKI [JP]
- [A] HAN AND K K WANG S: "Study on the pressurized underfill encapsulation of flip chips", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPONENTS, PACKAGING AND MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY. PART B: ADVANCED PACKAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, vol. 4, no. 20, 1 November 1997 (1997-11-01), pages 434 - 442, XP002075500, ISSN: 1070-9894
- See references of WO 0070678A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 1190448 A1 20020327; EP 1190448 A4 20041124; JP 2003500833 A 20030107; KR 20020035477 A 20020511
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 99923109 A 19990514; JP 2000619029 A 19990514; KR 20017014402 A 20011112