Global Patent Index - EP 1190612 B1

EP 1190612 B1 2002-11-27 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA BETWEEN PICK-AND-PLACE ROBOTS AND A FEEDING UNIT, PICK-AND-PLACE ROBOT AND FEEDING UNIT

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING DATA BETWEEN PICK-AND-PLACE ROBOTS AND A FEEDING UNIT, PICK-AND-PLACE ROBOT AND FEEDING UNIT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DATENÜBERTRAGUNG ZWISCHEN EINEM BESTÜCKAUTOMATEN UND EINER ZUFÜHREINHEIT, BESTÜCKAUTOMAT UND ZUFÜHREINHEIT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR TRANSFERT DE DONNEES ENTRE UN AUTOMATE D'EQUIPEMENT ET UNE UNITE D'AMENEE, AUTOMATE D'EQUIPEMENT ET UNITE D'AMENEE Y RELATIFS

Publication

EP 1190612 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00952901 A

Priority

  • DE 0002177 W
  • DE 19931054 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19931054A1] Until now, data between a pick-and-place robot (1) and a feeding unit (3) is transmitted by wire, which leads to a fixed raster for the arrangement of the feeding units (3) on the pick-and place robots (1). According to the invention, the data to be exchanged between pick-and-place robots (1) and the feeding unit (3) is optically transmitted via an optical waveguide (10), whereby the optical transmitters (7, 13) and the optical receivers (8, 14) of the feeding unit (3, 11) can be coupled in any position on the optical waveguide (10). The feeding units (3, 11) can thus be coupled in a raster-free manner to the pick-and-place robots (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05K 13/08; H04B 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 13/04 (2006.01); G08C 23/06 (2006.01); H04B 10/00 (2006.01); H04B 10/22 (2006.01); H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H05K 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 23/06 (2013.01); H05K 13/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19931054 A1 20010118; CN 1359609 A 20020717; EP 1190612 A1 20020327; EP 1190612 B1 20021127; JP 2003504901 A 20030204; KR 100454976 B1 20041106; WO 0103489 A1 20010111

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-04-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050704

2006-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050704

2005-07-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050704

2004-10-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041013

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-09-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040920

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040716

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040708

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-05 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040705

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1190612E

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000847 20030109

2003-01-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-04-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ESCHENWECK, FRIEDRICH

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011213

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE