Global Patent Index - EP 1190783 A3

EP 1190783 A3 2003-06-04 - Manufacture of stapling wire

Title (en)

Manufacture of stapling wire

Title (de)

Herstellung von Heftdraht

Title (fr)

Fabrication de fil à brocher

Publication

EP 1190783 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01121203 A

Priority

  • DE 10044982 A
  • DE 10051493 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1190783A2] The wire is drawn in two stages from an initial to a final size, and reduced in diameter by 80%. During the drawing process, the wire is not subjected to heat treatment. The wire is of a material with a carbon content of less than 0,1%, esp. less than 0,06%, and which a reduction in diameter of more than 99%. The initial diameter is less than 10mm, esp. 5,5mm, and the final diameter is less than 1mm, pref. between 0,7 and 0,3mm. Between first and second drawing stages, the wire is surface-treated, esp. galvanized.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 1/00; B21C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 1/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1190783 A2 20020327; EP 1190783 A3 20030604; US 2002083753 A1 20020704

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21C 1/00 A

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 21C 1/04 B

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI