Global Patent Index - EP 1191094 A3

EP 1191094 A3 2003-06-11 - Detergent composition

Title (en)

Detergent composition

Title (de)

Waschmittel

Title (fr)

Composition Detergente

Publication

EP 1191094 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01120861 A

Priority

DE 10044471 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1191094A2] Detergent composition comprises an anionic surfactant, a nonionic and amphoteric surfactant, a cationic polymer, a phosphate and optionally a layered silicate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/22; C11D 1/83; C11D 1/94; C11D 3/00; C11D 3/06; C11D 3/12; C11D 3/37; C11D 3/382

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3742 (2013.01); C11D 3/06 (2013.01); C11D 3/1253 (2013.01); C11D 3/227 (2013.01); C11D 3/3719 (2013.01); C11D 3/3723 (2013.01); C11D 3/3769 (2013.01); C11D 3/3776 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1191094 A2 20020327; EP 1191094 A3 20030611; DE 10044471 A1 20020321; US 2002151454 A1 20021017; US 6616705 B2 20030909

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-07 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031212

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/22 A

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/37 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/382 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/83 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/94 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/06 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/00 B

2003-06-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/12 B

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010830

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI