Global Patent Index - EP 1191132 A3

EP 1191132 A3 2002-11-06 - Operation control system for single spindle driving spinning machines

Title (en)

Operation control system for single spindle driving spinning machines

Title (de)

Betriebssteuersystem für Spinnmaschinen mit Einzelspindelantrieb

Title (fr)

Systéme de commande de fonctionnement pour des métiers à filer avec des broches à entraînement individuel

Publication

EP 1191132 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01121785 A

Priority

JP 2000289192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1191132A2] In an operation control system for single spindle driving spinning machines: a spindle computer provided in each spindle drives controls a motor provided in the corresponding spindle; a frame computer, which is provided in each spinning machine which is connected with a plurality of spindle computers provided in the spinning machine through communication means, controls operation of the corresponding spinning machine; and a host computer connected with a plurality of frame computers through communication means keeps operation condition of each frame under control. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/244; D01H 1/16; D01H 1/34; G05B 19/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/244 (2006.01); D01H 1/32 (2006.01); D01H 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/32 (2013.01); D01H 1/244 (2013.01); D01H 13/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1191132 A2 20020327; EP 1191132 A3 20021106; EP 1191132 B1 20060524; CN 100430541 C 20081105; CN 1345987 A 20020424; DE 60119856 D1 20060629; JP 2002105770 A 20020410; JP 3596451 B2 20041202

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-19 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20071110

2007-05-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20070221

2007-05-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG / RIETER INGOLSTADT SPIN

- Effective date: 20070223

2007-04-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20070221

2007-04-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG / RIETER INGOLSTADT SPIN

- Effective date: 20070223

2007-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20070221

2006-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-25 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060825

2006-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60119856 P 20060629

2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2006-05-24 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2005-12-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF CONTROLLING A OPERATION CONTROL SYSTEM FOR SINGLE SPINDLE DRIVING SPINNING MACHINES

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030520

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 01H 1/244 A, 7D 01H 1/34 B, 7D 01H 1/16 B, 7G 05B 19/042 B

2002-03-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010920

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI