Global Patent Index - EP 1191135 A3

EP 1191135 A3 2002-11-13 - Aprons for doubleapron-drafting machine

Title (en)

Aprons for doubleapron-drafting machine

Title (de)

Riemchen für Doppelriemchenstreckwerke

Title (fr)

Courroies pour banc à étirer à courroies doublées

Publication

EP 1191135 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01129185 A

Priority

  • DE 19709580 A
  • DE 19719773 A
  • DE 19722528 A
  • EP 98102622 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0863233A2] A double strap drawing frame has a suction zone which starts near the outlet roller pair, and extends over part of the stretch covered by the belts (6) between the outlet roller pair and the feed cylinder (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/86; D01H 5/26; D01H 5/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/66 (2006.01); D01H 5/26 (2006.01); D01H 5/62 (2006.01); D01H 5/64 (2006.01); D01H 5/72 (2006.01); D01H 5/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/625 (2013.01); D01H 5/26 (2013.01); D01H 5/72 (2013.01); D01H 5/86 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0863233 A2 19980909; EP 0863233 A3 19990512; EP 0863233 B1 20030507; BR 9807481 A 20020716; CN 1082574 C 20020410; CN 1196409 A 19981021; CN 1252331 C 20060419; CN 1370870 A 20020925; DE 19758757 C2 20030717; DE 19758758 C2 20030717; DE 19758759 B4 20060316; DE 59808211 D1 20030612; DE 59810426 D1 20040122; DE 59810641 D1 20040226; DE 59811969 D1 20041021; EP 1191134 A2 20020327; EP 1191134 A3 20021120; EP 1191134 B1 20040121; EP 1191135 A2 20020327; EP 1191135 A3 20021113; EP 1191135 B1 20031210; EP 1191136 A2 20020327; EP 1191136 A3 20021120; EP 1191136 B1 20040915; ES 2196411 T3 20031216; ES 2212789 T3 20040801; ES 2215104 T3 20041001; ES 2227050 T3 20050401; JP 2005042297 A 20050217; JP 2005089961 A 20050407; JP 4212008 B2 20090121; JP 4212054 B2 20090121; JP H111831 A 19990106; TR 199800394 A2 19981123; TR 199800394 A3 19981123; US 6112509 A 20000905; US 6370737 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150216

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-12-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810426

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810426

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130408

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090217

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090217

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080225

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-12-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212789 T3

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810426 P 20040122

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0863233 P

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2003-12-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021115

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 01H 5/86 A, 7D 01H 5/72 B, 7D 01H 5/26 B

2002-08-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DR.-ING.ARTZT, PETER

2002-08-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZOUDLIK, HOLGER DIPL.- ING.

2002-03-27 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 863233

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR IT LI