Global Patent Index - EP 1191173 A3

EP 1191173 A3 2002-11-20 - Closure device for use with openable door or window

Title (en)

Closure device for use with openable door or window

Title (de)

Verriegelungsvorrichtung für Türen oder Fenster

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage pour portes ou fenêtres

Publication

EP 1191173 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01308006 A

Priority

  • GB 0023306 A
  • GB 0026895 A
  • GB 0106130 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1191173A2] A closure device (14) for use with a movable closure member which is mounted for movement between open and closed positions with respect to a fixed frame in which is it mounted, and being intended to be mounted on a closing face of the closure member and to be co-operative with a keeper mounted on the fixed frame to lock the closure member in the closed position. The closure device comprises: an actuator device (15) which is adapted to be mounted in the closing face of the movable member; an elongate actuator element (16a) which is linearly displacable in a direction generally lengthwise of the closing face, and being displacable between an operative position and an inoperative position by operation of the actuator device; and at least one locking element (16) connected to the elongate actuator element (16a) and movable into and out of engagement with a locking formation on the keeper, and having an engaging portion which engages with the locking formation so as to resist forced separation of the closure device and the keeper in a direction generally perpendicular to the closing face. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/12 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/12 (2013.01); E05C 9/1808 (2013.01); E05C 9/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1191173 A2 20020327; EP 1191173 A3 20021120; GB 0122630 D0 20011107; GB 2367587 A 20020410

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040301

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-08-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-07-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030513

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI