Global Patent Index - EP 1191289 A3

EP 1191289 A3 2002-11-06 - For a household electrical appliance, a hinge provided with a passage for electric cables or tubes

Title (en)

For a household electrical appliance, a hinge provided with a passage for electric cables or tubes

Title (de)

Für ein elektrisches Haushaltsgerät, ein Scharnier mit einer Durchführung für elektrische Kabel oder Rohre

Title (fr)

Pour un appareil électroménager, une charniére pourvue d'un passage pour des câbles électriques ou de tubes

Publication

EP 1191289 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01121913 A

Priority

IT MI20000540 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1191289A2] A hinge for connecting a fixed structure or casing (3) of a household electrical appliance (9) to a movable part (5) of this latter, such as a refrigerator door, a dishwasher door or the like, said movable part supporting a user device such as an electrical member or a drink dispenser, said hinge comprising a body (1) provided with a base (2) to be fixed to one chosen from said structure (3) and said movable part (5), said body (1) being provided with a seat (7) for a hinge pin (6) associated with the other of said structure (3) and said movable part (5). The hinge body (1) is provided with an internal cavity (10) and comprises on one side (13) an elongate aperture (11) opening into said cavity (10), this latter communicating with a through hole (14) provided in the hinge base (2), there passing through said hole (4) and said aperture (11) at least one electric cable or pipe (17) connected to said user device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/02; A47L 15/42; E05D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); E05D 5/06 (2006.01); E05D 11/00 (2006.01); F25D 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4261 (2013.01); A47L 15/4274 (2013.01); E05D 5/065 (2013.01); E05D 11/0081 (2013.01); F25D 23/028 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/10 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/31 (2013.01); F25D 2323/024 (2013.01); F25D 2400/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1191289 A2 20020327; EP 1191289 A3 20021106; EP 1191289 B1 20090617; BR 0104268 A 20020507; BR 0104268 B1 20090505; DE 60138989 D1 20090730; IT 250456 Y1 20030910; IT MI20000540 U1 20020326; IT MI20000540 V0 20000926

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090617

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090917

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100318

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090917

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090928

2009-07-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60138989 P 20090730

2009-06-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-06-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-02-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: HOUSEHOLD ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE WITH A HINGE PROVIDED WITH A PASSAGE FOR ELECTRIC CABLES OR TUBES

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041229

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI