Global Patent Index - EP 1192333 B1

EP 1192333 B1 2003-06-04 - COMPONENT THAT CAN BE SUBJECTED TO HOT GAS, ESPECIALLY A TURBINE BLADE

Title (en)

COMPONENT THAT CAN BE SUBJECTED TO HOT GAS, ESPECIALLY A TURBINE BLADE

Title (de)

HEISSGASBEAUFSCHLAGBARES BAUTEIL, INSBESONDERE TURBINENSCHAUFEL

Title (fr)

COMPOSANT, NOTAMMENT AUBE DE TURBINE, POUVANT ETRE EXPOSE A UN GAZ CHAUD

Publication

EP 1192333 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00942078 A

Priority

  • EP 00942078 A
  • EP 0005525 W
  • EP 99112370 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0100965A1] The invention relates to a component (10) that can be subjected to a hot gas, especially a turbine blade. At least one channel (13) is provided. Said channel can be subjected to a cooling fluid and is delimited by two first walls (16, 17), which face each other and have turbulators (20, 21) with the same direction of inclination. The turbulators (20) of the first wall (16) have a different angle of inclination ( alpha ) in relation to a direction of flow (22) of the cooling fluid to the turbulators (21) of the second wall (17) in order to avoid constrictions (23).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/187 (2013.01); F05D 2260/2212 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0100965 A1 20010104; DE 50002464 D1 20030710; EP 1192333 A1 20020403; EP 1192333 B1 20030604; JP 2003503620 A 20030128; JP 4489336 B2 20100623; US 6641362 B1 20031104

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160615

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160615

2017-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002464

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150902

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150821

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150610

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150608

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130615

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-10-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002464 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-18 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: TIEMANN, PETER

2003-06-18 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHEURLEN, MICHAEL

2003-06-18 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: ANDING, DIRK

2003-06-18 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: BOLMS, HANS-THOMAS

2003-06-18 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: STRASSBERGER, MICHAEL

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011129

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE