Global Patent Index - EP 1193180 A8

EP 1193180 A8 2002-09-04 - Folding carton with internal supporting enclosure

Title (en)

Folding carton with internal supporting enclosure

Title (de)

Faltschachtel mit Innenkammer

Title (fr)

Boîte pliante avec une chambre de support interne

Publication

EP 1193180 A8 (DE)

Application

EP 01109088 A

Priority

DE 20016959 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1193180A1] An inner space(60) is formed inside the box, the side walls of which are formed by first(36) and second(38) glued flaps. A first wall element(30) forming the underside of the inner space is connected to the rear wall by a first glued flap fold line(22), the width(BK) of which is smaller than the width(BS) of a side wall element(18), and formed on the first glued flap(20) by a second glued flap fold line(34) so that in the folded state of the box the first wall element is parallel with and at a distance from the rear wall. The first glued flap is formed on the first wall element by a glued flap fold line(40).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/5016 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20016959 U1 20001221; EP 1193180 A1 20020403; EP 1193180 A8 20020904; EP 1193180 B1 20050706; ES 2244513 T3 20051216

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130413

2014-06-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140609

2014-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130430

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50106677

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130412

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131231

2013-12-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130412

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CD CARTONDRUCK GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CD CARTONDRUCK AG, 74182 OBERSULM, DE

- Document: DE 50106677

- Effective date: 20120829

2012-10-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50106677

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DIPL.-ING. HANS MUELLER, DR.-IN, DE

- Effective date: 20120829

2012-10-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50106677

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DR.-ING. GERHARD CLEMENS, DR. R, DE

- Effective date: 20120829

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50106677

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DIPL.-ING. HANS MUELLER, DR.-IN, DE

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060407

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2244513 T3

2005-11-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-08-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50106677 P 20050811

2005-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2005-07-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040310

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CD CARTONDRUCK AG

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI