Global Patent Index - EP 1193388 A3

EP 1193388 A3 2003-06-04 - Exhaust gas purifying apparatus for an internal combustion engine with a supercharger

Title (en)

Exhaust gas purifying apparatus for an internal combustion engine with a supercharger

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Abgasreinigung für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit einem Turbolader

Title (fr)

Dispositif de purification de gaz d'échappement pour un moteur à combustion interne avec un turbocompresseur

Publication

EP 1193388 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01123579 A

Priority

JP 2000302759 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1193388A2] An exhaust gas purifying apparatus for an internal combustion engine with a turbocharger is provided with an introduction port for EGR gas disposed upstream of a compressor and a throttle valve disposed upstream of the introduction port, and comprised of a fail safe means that the portion on the upstream side of the compressor does not have any excessive negative pressure even if a malfunction occurs in the throttle valve. The exhaust gas purifying apparatus for an internal combustion engine with a turbocharger is provided with a supercharger (6) having a turbine (6b) disposed in an exhaust passage (16) and a compressor (6a) disposed in an intake passage (3) and having an exhaust gas recirculation system (23,24 and 25) for connecting the exhaust passage (16) downstream of the turbine (6b) and the intake passage (3) with each other and for recirculating a part of exhaust gas back to an intake system of the internal combustion engine, wherein an introduction port for recirculating the part of the exhaust gas and a throttle valve (20) for opening/closing the intake passage (3) as desired are arranged in this order. A fail safe unit (21) for allowing a predetermined flow rate of intake air to flow to the compressor (6a) and giving a load, when the throttle valve (20) is fully closed, is provided in the intake passage (3) upstream of the compressor (6a). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07; F02B 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 37/00 (2006.01); F02B 39/16 (2006.01); F02D 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 9/10 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); F02D 21/08 (2006.01); F02D 23/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 43/00 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02M 25/07 (2006.01); F02B 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/1045 (2013.01); F02M 26/15 (2016.02); F02B 29/0406 (2013.01); F02D 2009/0277 (2013.01); F02M 26/06 (2013.01); F02M 26/10 (2016.02); F02M 26/23 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1193388 A2 20020403; EP 1193388 A3 20030604; JP 2002106398 A 20020410; JP 3791318 B2 20060628

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140822

2013-02-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031230

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011001

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI