Global Patent Index - EP 1193397 A3

EP 1193397 A3 2002-09-04 - Plastic housing with metal suds

Title (en)

Plastic housing with metal suds

Title (de)

Kunststoffgehäuse mit Metallstutzen

Title (fr)

Boitier en plastique avec bandes metalliques

Publication

EP 1193397 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01119802 A

Priority

DE 10048758 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1193397A2] The pump housing which is made from plastics has an inlet pipe and outlet pipe and covers a pump chamber at the end. At least one of the pipes has a metal connector (2) so that it can be connected onto a pipeline. The connector has a connecting sleeve (6) which fits round the plastics pipe of the housing. The sleeve can have external thread so that the pipe line can be screwed onto same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 13/02; F04D 29/42; F04D 29/62; F16L 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/40 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/026 (2013.01); F04D 29/406 (2013.01); F04D 29/4293 (2013.01); F05D 2300/10 (2013.01); F05D 2300/43 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1193397 A2 20020403; EP 1193397 A3 20020904; EP 1193397 B1 20080604; DE 10048758 A1 20020411; DE 50114007 D1 20080717

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150831

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150816

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160429

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150816

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150816

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50114007

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140818

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140808

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140813

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140813

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-05-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090305

2008-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114007 P 20080717

2008-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILO AG

2007-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061228

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030227

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04D 13/02 A, 7F 04D 29/62 B, 7F 04D 29/42 B, 7F 16L 47/00 B

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI