Global Patent Index - EP 1193723 A8

EP 1193723 A8 2003-06-25 - MAGNETIC FERRITE POWDER, MAGNETIC FERRITE SINTER, LAYERED FERRITE PART, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING LAYERED FERRITE PART

Title (en)

MAGNETIC FERRITE POWDER, MAGNETIC FERRITE SINTER, LAYERED FERRITE PART, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING LAYERED FERRITE PART

Title (de)

FERRIT MAGNETPULVER, GESINTERTES MAGNETISCHESFERRIT, LAMINIERTES FERRIT-TEIL UNDHERSTELLUNGS-VERFAHREN EINES TEILS

Title (fr)

POUDRE DE FERRITE MAGNETIQUE, AGGLOMERE DE FERRITE MAGNETIQUE, STRUCTURE DE FERRITE EN COUCHES, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE STRUCTURE DE FERRITE EN COUCHES

Publication

EP 1193723 A8 (EN)

Application

EP 01926025 A

Priority

  • JP 0103699 W
  • JP 2000131271 A
  • JP 2001030250 A
  • JP 2001049276 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1193723A1] Provided is magnetic ferrite powder in which a peak intensity ratio of Z phase (M3Me2Fe24O41: M = one or more kinds of alkaline-earth metal, Me = one or more kinds from Co, Ni, Mn, Zn, Mg and Cu) of hexagonal ferrite is 30% or higher in X-ray diffraction and a peak value of a grain size distribution is in a range from 0.1 mu m to 3 mu m. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 1/34; C04B 35/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 18/00 (2006.01); C01G 49/00 (2006.01); C01G 51/00 (2006.01); C01G 53/00 (2006.01); C04B 35/26 (2006.01); H01F 1/34 (2006.01); H01F 17/00 (2006.01); H01F 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C04B 35/62675 (2013.01); B32B 18/00 (2013.01); C01G 49/0036 (2013.01); C01G 49/0063 (2013.01); C01G 49/0072 (2013.01); C01G 49/009 (2013.01); C01G 51/006 (2013.01); C01G 53/006 (2013.01); C04B 35/2633 (2013.01); C04B 35/265 (2013.01); C04B 35/6261 (2013.01); H01F 1/348 (2013.01); H01F 17/0033 (2013.01); H01F 41/0246 (2013.01); C01P 2002/72 (2013.01); C01P 2002/74 (2013.01); C01P 2002/85 (2013.01); C01P 2004/04 (2013.01); C01P 2004/51 (2013.01); C01P 2004/61 (2013.01); C01P 2004/62 (2013.01); C01P 2004/80 (2013.01); C01P 2006/10 (2013.01); C01P 2006/12 (2013.01); C01P 2006/32 (2013.01); C01P 2006/33 (2013.01); C01P 2006/42 (2013.01); C04B 2235/3201 (2013.01); C04B 2235/3203 (2013.01); C04B 2235/3206 (2013.01); C04B 2235/3215 (2013.01); C04B 2235/3217 (2013.01); C04B 2235/3262 (2013.01); C04B 2235/3274 (2013.01); C04B 2235/3275 (2013.01); C04B 2235/3277 (2013.01); C04B 2235/3279 (2013.01); C04B 2235/3281 (2013.01); C04B 2235/3284 (2013.01); C04B 2235/3298 (2013.01); C04B 2235/3409 (2013.01); C04B 2235/36 (2013.01); C04B 2235/365 (2013.01); C04B 2235/5409 (2013.01); C04B 2235/5436 (2013.01); C04B 2235/5445 (2013.01); C04B 2235/6025 (2013.01); C04B 2235/656 (2013.01); C04B 2235/767 (2013.01); C04B 2235/77 (2013.01); C04B 2235/784 (2013.01); C04B 2235/786 (2013.01); C04B 2235/80 (2013.01); C04B 2235/85 (2013.01); C04B 2235/9615 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12465 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1193723 A1 20020403; EP 1193723 A4 20080625; EP 1193723 A8 20030625; CN 1184650 C 20050112; CN 1366682 A 20020828; HK 1048886 A1 20050826; US 2004069969 A1 20040415; US 6749768 B2 20040615; WO 0184566 A1 20011108

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090819

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090408

2008-06-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20080528

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020215

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL