Global Patent Index - EP 1194600 B1

EP 1194600 B1 2003-06-25 - METHOD OF PRODUCING NON-GRAIN-ORIENTED ELECTRICAL SHEET

Title (en)

METHOD OF PRODUCING NON-GRAIN-ORIENTED ELECTRICAL SHEET

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON NICHTKORNORIENTIERTEM ELEKTROBLECH

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE TOLE MAGNETIQUE A GRAINS NON ORIENTES

Publication

EP 1194600 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00922652 A

Priority

  • DE 19918484 A
  • EP 0003558 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19918484A1] Non-grain-oriented electrical sheet production, using a wide range of steel starting materials and a wide range of hot rolling, coiling, pickling, cold rolling and final treatment parameters, is new. A non-grain-oriented electrical steel sheet is produced from a starting material, especially slabs which have been reheated to <= 1250 deg C and rough rolled, cast strips or thin slabs, of steel of composition (by wt.) <= 0.06% C, 0.03-2.5% Si, <= 0.4% Al, 0.05-1.0% Mn, <= 0.02% S, optional further alloying additions, balance Fe and impurities by (a) hot rolling to <= 3.5 mm thick strip in a finishing mill line at an entry temperature of <= 1100 deg C and an end temperature of \-770 deg C; (b) coiling at \-770 deg C; (c) pickling and then cold rolling to 0.2-1 mm thick strip in several passes with a total deformation of \}85%; and (d) carrying out a final treatment, preferably a final or recrystallization anneal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 3/02 (2006.01); B21B 37/00 (2006.01); B21B 37/76 (2006.01); C21D 8/12 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/06 (2006.01); H01F 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/06 (2013.01); C21D 8/1205 (2013.01); C21D 8/1222 (2013.01); C22C 38/002 (2013.01); C22C 38/004 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C21D 8/1233 (2013.01); C21D 8/1272 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19918484 A1 20001026; DE 19918484 C2 20020404; AT 243771 T 20030715; AU 4296900 A 20001110; BR 0009990 A 20020108; CA 2367602 A1 20001102; DE 50002662 D1 20030731; EP 1194600 A2 20020410; EP 1194600 B1 20030625; ES 2200866 T3 20040316; JP 2002543274 A 20021217; JP 2009185386 A 20090820; KR 100702242 B1 20070403; MX PA01010684 A 20030820; PL 194747 B1 20070629; PL 360057 A1 20040906; US 6582528 B1 20030624; WO 0065103 A2 20001102; WO 0065103 A3 20010405

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180423

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170501

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170425

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110420

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002662

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002662

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100422

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100504

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *THYSSENKRUPP STAHL A.G.KAISER-WILHELM-STRASSE 10,

- Effective date: 20050523

2006-01-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2005-11-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-11-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-10-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-10-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP ELECTRICAL STEEL GMBH

2005-05-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *THYSSENKRUPP STAHL A.G.KAISER-WILHELM-STRASSE 10,

- Effective date: 20050523

2005-05-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200866 T3

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-09-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-25 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-09-25 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-09-25 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002662 P 20030731

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP ELECTRICAL STEEL EBG GMBH

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020516

2002-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010811

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI