Global Patent Index - EP 1194953 A4

EP 1194953 A4 2002-09-04 - CONTROLLABLY DEGRADABLE COMPOSITION OF HETEROATOM CARBOCYCLIC OR EPOXY RESIN AND CURING AGENT

Title (en)

CONTROLLABLY DEGRADABLE COMPOSITION OF HETEROATOM CARBOCYCLIC OR EPOXY RESIN AND CURING AGENT

Title (de)

KONTROLLIERT ABBAUBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG BASIEREND AUF EINEM HETEROATOM-CARBONSÄURE- ODER EPOXY-HARZ UND EINEM HÄRTUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DONT LA DEGRADATION EST REGULABLE, A BASE DE RESINE EPOXY OU CARBOCYCLIQUE D'HETEROATOME ET A BASE D'UN AGENT DE DURCISSEMENT

Publication

EP 1194953 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00942630 A

Priority

  • US 0011878 W
  • US 13948699 P
  • US 19339200 P
  • US 19339100 P
  • US 21047000 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0079582A1] A reworkable underfilling sealing mateiral (33) for the attachment of a semiconductor device (32) to a carrier substrate (31) is prepared from a composition comprising a curable resin (a) which is a resin with a (thio)ether or carbonate core structure and a heteroatom-containing carbocyclic structure, an epoxy resin having at least one alkylene oxide residue, or an epoxy resin with a monepoxide (thio)ester or carbonate coreactant diluent; and (b) a curing agent including a polyamine, an epoxy- or novolac-modified amine, an amide compound or an imidazole; optionally with an anhydride.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/56; C08K 3/36; C08L 63/00; C08L 69/00; C08L 71/00; H01L 21/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 59/22 (2006.01); C08G 59/30 (2006.01); C08G 65/16 (2006.01); C08G 75/06 (2006.01); C08L 63/00 (2006.01); C08L 71/00 (2006.01); C08L 81/02 (2006.01); H01L 21/56 (2006.01); H01L 21/60 (2006.01); H01L 23/29 (2006.01); H01L 23/31 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 63/00 (2013.01); C08G 59/22 (2013.01); H01L 21/563 (2013.01); H01L 23/293 (2013.01); H01L 24/29 (2013.01); H01L 24/83 (2013.01); H01L 24/98 (2013.01); H01L 2224/16225 (2013.01); H01L 2224/32225 (2013.01); H01L 2224/73203 (2013.01); H01L 2224/73204 (2013.01); H01L 2224/83192 (2013.01); H01L 2924/00014 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01005 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01006 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01012 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01013 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01015 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01016 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01018 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01019 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0102 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01023 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01027 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01029 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01033 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01039 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01055 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01057 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01068 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01073 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01075 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01077 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01082 (2013.01); H01L 2924/07811 (2013.01); H01L 2924/14 (2013.01); H01L 2924/15787 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. H01L 2224/73204 + H01L 2224/16225 + H01L 2224/32225 + H01L 2924/00
  2. H01L 2224/83192 + H01L 2224/32225 + H01L 2924/00
  3. H01L 2924/07811 + H01L 2924/00
  4. H01L 2224/83192 + H01L 2224/73204 + H01L 2224/16225 + H01L 2224/32225 + H01L 2924/00
  5. H01L 2924/15787 + H01L 2924/00
  6. H01L 2924/00014 + H01L 2224/0401

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5512613 A 19960430 - AFZALI-ARDAKANI ALI [US], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 04 31 March 1998 (1998-03-31)
  • [X] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 20, 14 May 1984, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 157412, SERGEEV ET AL.: "Diglycidyl aromatic thio ethers and epoxy polymers derived from them" XP002932993 & VYSOKOMOL. SOEDIN., SER.A(1984), 26(1),208-211VYSOKOMOL. SOEDIN., SER.A(1984), 26(1),208-211
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 443 (C - 1239) 18 August 1994 (1994-08-18)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 05 31 May 1996 (1996-05-31)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1999, no. 04 30 April 1999 (1999-04-30)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 433 (C - 543) 15 November 1988 (1988-11-15)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 528 (C - 1258) 6 October 1994 (1994-10-06)
  • See also references of WO 0079582A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0079582 A1 20001228; WO 0079582 A9 20010315; AU 5722700 A 20010109; CA 2374187 A1 20001228; CN 1178287 C 20041201; CN 1384975 A 20021211; EP 1194953 A1 20020410; EP 1194953 A4 20020904; JP 2003502484 A 20030121; JP 4718070 B2 20110706; KR 100372211 B1 20030214; MX PA01013054 A 20030820

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050830

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040917

2002-09-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011224

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI