Global Patent Index - EP 1195481 A3

EP 1195481 A3 2003-06-04 - Parking-aid device for car parks

Title (en)

Parking-aid device for car parks

Title (de)

Einparkhilfe für Autoabstellanlagen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour faciliter le stationnement dans les garages à voitures

Publication

EP 1195481 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01123200 A

Priority

DE 10049850 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1195481A2] The mechanical parking aid for indication of the limit of the parking space in vehicle drive directions comprises a sufficiently long vertical indicator rod (2) mounted on a carrier element (1) in the form of a base plate (3) with a socket seat (6) for the indicator rod.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 6/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 6/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 6/426 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1195481 A2 20020410; EP 1195481 A3 20030604; DE 10049850 A1 20020425

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-04-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): FR GB SE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 04H 6/42 A

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI