Global Patent Index - EP 1195619 A9

EP 1195619 A9 2003-06-25 - NON-INVASIVE RADIO-IMAGING ANALYSIS DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR EXAMINING SMALL ANIMALS IN VIVO, AND METHOD FOR USING SAME

Title (en)

NON-INVASIVE RADIO-IMAGING ANALYSIS DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR EXAMINING SMALL ANIMALS IN VIVO, AND METHOD FOR USING SAME

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur nicht-invasiven Analyse durch Erstellen eines Strahlungsbildes, insbesondere zur in-vivo Untersuchung von Kleintieren, und Verfahren zur Anwendung dieser Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'analyse non invasif par radio-imagerie notamment pour l'examen in vivo de petits animaux, et procédé de mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 1195619 A9 (FR)

Application

EP 02000824 A

Priority

  • EP 96922950 A
  • FR 9507345 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2735874A1] A non-invasive analysis device including a plurality of sensors (110) combined with collimating structures (120) having a common source focus (O) and processing means (300) providing an AND-type combinational logic function of the output of the sensors (110) for sensing two coincidently transmitted beams that are at least slightly angularly correlated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01T 1/29; G21K 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01T 7/00 (2006.01); G01T 1/161 (2006.01); G01T 1/29 (2006.01); G21H 5/02 (2006.01); G21K 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21H 5/02 (2013.01); A61B 6/4258 (2013.01); A61B 6/508 (2013.01); G01T 1/2985 (2013.01); G21K 1/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2735874 A1 19961227; FR 2735874 B1 19970822; DE 69623622 D1 20021017; DE 69623622 T2 20030807; EP 0834088 A1 19980408; EP 0834088 B1 20020911; EP 1195619 A2 20020410; EP 1195619 A3 20030212; EP 1195619 A9 20030625; JP 2005099027 A 20050414; JP 4198660 B2 20081217; JP H11508048 A 19990713; US 2002024024 A1 20020228; US 6225631 B1 20010501; US 6407391 B1 20020618; WO 9701108 A1 19970109

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-13 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20110303

2008-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080417

2003-10-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-10-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01T 1/29 A

2003-02-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 21K 1/02 B

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MASTRIPPOLITO, ROLAND

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PLOUX, LYDIE

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHARON, YVES PIERRE

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PINOT, LAURENT

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VALENTIN, LUC

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VALDA OCHOA, ALEJANDRO ANIBAL

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIEBERT, RAINER

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LANIECE, PHILIPPE

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MASTRIPPOLITO, ROLAND

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PLOUX, LYDIE

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHARON, YVES PIERRE

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PINOT, LAURENT

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VALENTIN, LUC

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VALDA OCHOA, ALEJANDRO ANIBAL

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIEBERT, RAINER

2002-10-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LANIECE, PHILIPPE

2002-04-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 834088

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT