Global Patent Index - EP 1196311 B1

EP 1196311 B1 2003-06-04 - DEVICE FOR ACTUATING ELECTRIC FUNCTIONAL ELEMENTS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ACTUATING ELECTRIC FUNCTIONAL ELEMENTS

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG ZUR BETÄTIGUNG ELEKTRISCHER FUNKTIONSELEMENTE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME POUR ACTIONNER DES ELEMENTS FONCTIONNELS ELECTRIQUES

Publication

EP 1196311 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00954358 A

Priority

  • DE 0002389 W
  • DE 19934077 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0105628A1] The invention relates to a system for actuating electric functional elements comprising at least two physically separated actuating modules, whereby a) a defined electric function can be selectively triggered by any of the actuating modules, b) each actuating module has an electric actuating element for triggering the electric function and c) both actuating elements for triggering the electric function are connected parallel to each other. According to the invention, one electric subassembly (B1-BN) is connected parallel to both actuating elements (1-N), whereby said subassembly is used to produce a characteristic electric code for the electric function which is to be triggered. A line controlled sensor circuit can thus be produced without any sensor prioritization .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 16/02; H01H 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 16/02 (2006.01); H01H 47/00 (2006.01); H03K 17/96 (2006.01); E05F 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 47/001 (2013.01); E05F 15/695 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/42 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01); Y10T 307/461 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0105628 A1 20010125; BR 0010822 A 20020305; DE 19934077 A1 20010802; DE 19934077 C2 20011220; EP 1196311 A1 20020417; EP 1196311 B1 20030604; JP 2003504271 A 20030204; JP 3650604 B2 20050525; US 2002109405 A1 20020815; US 6522026 B2 20030218

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-06-13 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070717

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070718

2008-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070717

2008-03-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-07-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060719

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-07-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-07-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060712

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-07-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060705

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-09-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002466 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010803

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE