Global Patent Index - EP 1196908 A4

EP 1196908 A4 2002-11-05 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ALLOCATING CHANNEL ELEMENT RESOURCES IN COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ALLOCATING CHANNEL ELEMENT RESOURCES IN COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUWEISUNG VON KANALELEMENTRESSOURCEN IN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'AFFECTATION DES RESSOURCES EN ELEMENTS DE CANAUX DANS DES SYSTEMES DE COMMUNICATION

Publication

EP 1196908 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00930196 A

Priority

  • US 0011411 W
  • US 34331899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6144646A] A communication system (200) includes a plurality of channel elements (201-05). A mobile station (101) communicates with a base station (114), both included in communication system (200), via a forward link (121) and a reverse link (122) communication. The communication system assigns a finite number (N) of channel elements (201-03) selected from plurality of channel elements (201-05) for forward link communication (121), inputs at least one forward link signal (210) associated with forward link (121) to each of N channel elements (201-03), determines a power gain requirement of forward link (121), adjusts power gain setting of each of N channel elements (201-03) such that an aggregate of power gain settings of N channel elements (201-03) substantially equals to the power gain requirement, outputs N forward link signals (231-33) with adjusted power gain accordingly, and combines N forward link signals (231-33) to form a combined forward link signal (250).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 17/00; H04B 7/216

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 7/005 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04W 52/343 (2013.01); H04W 52/346 (2013.01); H04W 72/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6144646 A 20001107; DE 60005360 D1 20031023; DE 60005360 T2 20040422; EP 1196908 A1 20020417; EP 1196908 A4 20021105; EP 1196908 B1 20030917; ES 2207515 T3 20040601; WO 0103096 A1 20010111

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GOOGLE TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS LLC, MOUNTAIN VIEW, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC. ( N.D. GES. D. STAATES DELAWARE ), LIBERTYVILLE, LLL., US

- Document: DE 60005360

2018-04-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60005360

- Representative's name: BETTEN & RESCH PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PART, DE

2018-01-19 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: GOOGLE TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS LLC, US

- Effective date: 20171214

2018-01-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GOOGLE TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS LLC, US

- Effective date: 20171214

2017-09-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170831 AND 20170906

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170503

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-10-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC., US

- Effective date: 20110912

2011-05-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC. ( N.D. GES. D. STAATES, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MOTOROLA, INC., SCHAUMBURG, US

- Document: DE 60005360

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-05-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC. ( N.D. GES. D. STAATES, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MOTOROLA, INC., SCHAUMBURG, ILL., US

- Document: DE 60005360

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-05-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GOOGLE TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS LLC, MOUNTAIN VIEW, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MOTOROLA, INC., SCHAUMBURG, ILL., US

- Document: DE 60005360

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090428

2011-02-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110127 AND 20110202

2005-02-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2207515 T3

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60005360 P 20031023

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021105

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08C 17/00 A, 7H 04B 7/216 B, 7H 04Q 7/30 B, 7H 04B 7/005 B

2002-11-05 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

2002-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR GB IT

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE