Global Patent Index - EP 1197306 A3

EP 1197306 A3 2002-12-18 - Flexible rotary cutting die

Title (en)

Flexible rotary cutting die

Title (de)

Folienmesser für Rotationsstanzvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Plaque de coupe flexible pour découpe rotative

Publication

EP 1197306 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 01308680 A

Priority

US 68669100 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1197306A2] A rotary cutting die (10) includes a durable, flexible rotary die plate (14) having an inner surface and an outer surface. A cutting rule (12) that defines a cutting design is supported by the die plate. The cutting rule incluees a cutting edge (16) which extends above the outer surface of the die plate, and a support edge (20) disposed within the die plate. The support edge includes a plurality of keyhole shaped notches (22). Preferably, a plurality of S-shaped hooks (24) are connected to the key-hole notches, and serve to reinforce the rotary die plate and to support the cutting rule in the rotary die plate. The rotary die plate is preferably formed from a durable and flexible urethane-based material that exhibits a low shrink factor during curing or hardening. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26F 1/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/44 (2013.01); B26F 1/384 (2013.01); B26F 2001/4463 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1197306 A2 20020417; EP 1197306 A3 20021218; CA 2358671 A1 20020411

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-10-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI