Global Patent Index - EP 1197571 A4

EP 1197571 A4 2002-09-11 - STEEL PRODUCT FOR OIL WELL HAVING HIGH STRENGTH AND BEING EXCELLENT IN RESISTANCE TO SULFIDE STRESS CRACKING

Title (en)

STEEL PRODUCT FOR OIL WELL HAVING HIGH STRENGTH AND BEING EXCELLENT IN RESISTANCE TO SULFIDE STRESS CRACKING

Title (de)

STAHLPRODUKT FÜR EINE ÖLBOHRLOCHWAND MIT HOHER FESTIGKEIT UND AUSGEZEICHNETER SCHWEFEL INDUZIERTER SPANNUNGSRISSKOROSSIONSBESTÄNDIG

Title (fr)

PRODUIT EN ACIER POUR PUITS DE PETROLE, DOTE D'UNE GRANDE SOLIDITE ET D'UNE EXCELLENTE RESISTANCE A LA CORROSION FISSURANTE PROVOQUEE PAR L'HYDROGENE SULFURE

Publication

EP 1197571 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00922970 A

Priority

  • JP 0002917 W
  • JP 12549799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1197571A1] This invention provides a high-strength steel material for an oil well, excellent in strength and SSC resistance, and having a yield strength of at least 120 ksi. The steel material contains C: 0.10 to 0.40%, Si </= 0.5%, Mn </= 0.5%, P </= 0.015%, S </= 0.0050%, Mo: 0.5 to 2.5%, A1: 0.005 to 0.1%, Ti: 0.005 to 0.1% and at least 3.4 times N, Nb: 0.01 to 0.1%, N </= 0.01% and B: 0.0005 to 0.0050%, wherein the yield strength expressed by ksi and the Mo content satisfy the following relation (1), the balance of the C, Mn and Mo contents satisfies the following relation (2), and the steel material may contain, whenever necessary, at least one of Cr </= 0.2%, W </= 0.5%, V: 0.01 to 0.3%, Zr: 0.001 to 0.01%, Ca: 0.001 to 0.01%, Mg: 0.001 to 0.01% and REM: 0.001 to 0.01%. <DF NUM="(1)"> alpha = Mo - 0.15YS >/= -18.9 </DF> <DF NUM="(2)"> beta = 2.7C + Mn + 2Mo >/= 2.0 </DF> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/00; C21D 6/00; C22C 38/14; C22C 38/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/18 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/06 (2006.01); C22C 38/12 (2006.01); C22C 38/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/06 (2013.01); C21D 1/18 (2013.01); C22C 38/001 (2013.01); C22C 38/12 (2013.01); C22C 38/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0828007 A1 19980311 - SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1995, no. 02 31 March 1995 (1995-03-31)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 409 (P - 931) 11 September 1989 (1989-09-11)
  • See also references of WO 0068450A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1197571 A1 20020417; EP 1197571 A4 20020911; AR 023265 A1 20020904; JP 4123722 B2 20080723; MX PA01011029 A 20030630; US 2002104592 A1 20020808; WO 0068450 A1 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040102

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030207

2002-09-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011206

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE