Global Patent Index - EP 1197715 A3

EP 1197715 A3 2002-09-04 - Building module

Title (en)

Building module

Title (de)

Raumzelle

Title (fr)

Cellule de bâtiment

Publication

EP 1197715 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01123818 A

Priority

  • DE 10050313 A
  • DE 10050312 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1197715A2] The cell structure, to form an enclosed cool zone, has walls (W) fitted with a thermal insulation (6) of at least two shaped sections (3) of a non-combustible material, stacked over each other between the wall facing plates (4,5) over the cell height. Locking profiles (8) are screwed in place at the end surfaces (9) of their butting edges. The gaps (10) between the butting edges are filled with a loose material (11). The insulation sections are of perlite particles together with CO2 gas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/06; E04B 1/76; E04H 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/94 (2006.01); E04H 5/10 (2006.01); F25D 23/06 (2006.01); E04B 1/61 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/063 (2013.01); E04B 1/94 (2013.01); E04H 5/10 (2013.01); E04B 1/6116 (2013.01); F25D 2201/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1197715 A2 20020417; EP 1197715 A3 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060810

2004-04-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VIESSMANN, HANS, DR.DR.

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VIESSMANN KAELTETECHNIK AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2004-04-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VIESSMANN, HANS, DR.DR.

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-06-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI