Global Patent Index - EP 1198443 B1

EP 1198443 B1 2004-12-15 - OXIDATIVE CLEAVAGE OF UNSATURATED OILS AND PRODUCTS OBTAINED THEREFROM

Title (en)

OXIDATIVE CLEAVAGE OF UNSATURATED OILS AND PRODUCTS OBTAINED THEREFROM

Title (de)

OXIDATIVE SPALTUNG UNGESÄTTIGTER ÖLE SOWIE DARAUS HERGESTELLTE PRODUKTE

Title (fr)

CLIVAGE OXYDANT D'HUILES INSATUREES ET PRODUITS OBTENUES A PARTIR DE CELLES-CI

Publication

EP 1198443 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 00940501 A

Priority

  • GB 0002220 W
  • GB 9914101 A
  • GB 9914103 A
  • GB 9914106 A
  • GB 0013329 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0078699A1] The invention provides a solid composite material comprising a matrix formed from a particulate or fibrous material and a cured thermosetting resin, wherein the cured thermosetting resin is derived from an oxidative cleavage product selected from aldehydes and peroxides and mixtures thereof formed by the oxidative cleavage of an unsaturated bond in an unsaturated plant or animal oil, other than the ozonolysis cleavage product of cashew nut shell liquid. Also provided is a process for the production of aldehydes and/or peroxides, which process comprises the treatment of a vegetable oil with ozone (e.g. in the presence of an alcohol as a solvent for the oil) so that hydroperoxides are produced, and the reductive cleavage of the hydroperoxides with a reducing sugar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 45/40; C08G 8/04; C08G 8/26; C08L 61/00; C08L 97/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B09B 3/00 (2006.01); C07C 45/40 (2006.01); C07C 409/04 (2006.01); C08G 8/04 (2006.01); C08G 8/26 (2006.01); C08J 5/00 (2006.01); C08K 3/00 (2006.01); C08L 61/00 (2006.01); C08L 97/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08L 61/00 (2013.01); C07C 45/40 (2013.01); C07C 407/00 (2013.01); C07C 409/04 (2013.01); C08G 8/04 (2013.01); C08G 8/26 (2013.01); C08L 97/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08L 61/00 + C08L 2666/26
  2. C08L 97/02 + C08L 2666/16
  3. C07C 407/00 + C07C 409/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0078699 A1 20001228; AT 284856 T 20050115; AU 5542900 A 20010109; BR 0011756 A 20020305; BR 0011756 B1 20110125; CA 2375271 A1 20001228; CA 2375271 C 20090922; DE 60016754 D1 20050120; DE 60016754 T2 20060105; EP 1198443 A1 20020424; EP 1198443 B1 20041215; JP 2003521565 A 20030715; US 6768029 B1 20040727

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170424

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170614

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170511

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050515

2006-03-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-20 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050620

2005-06-19 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050619

2005-06-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050619

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050326

2005-03-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-03-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050315

2005-03-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050315

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60016754 P 20050120

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CAMBRIDGE BIOPOLYMERS LIMITED

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020114

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI