Global Patent Index - EP 1198592 A4

EP 1198592 A4 2002-09-18 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDES INCORPORATING BOTH 2-AMINOADENINE AND 5-SUBSTITUTED PYRIMIDINES

Title (en)

OLIGONUCLEOTIDES INCORPORATING BOTH 2-AMINOADENINE AND 5-SUBSTITUTED PYRIMIDINES

Title (de)

OLIGONUCLEOTIDE DIE 2-AMINOADENIN UND 5-SUBSTITUIERTE PYRIMIDINE ENTHALTEN.

Title (fr)

OLIGONUCLEOTIDES COMPORTANT A LA FOIS 2-AMINOADENINE ET PYRIMIDINES 5-SUBSTITUEES

Publication

EP 1198592 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00947043 A

Priority

  • US 0018415 W
  • US 34810699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0102608A1] This invention presents oligonucleotides incorporating both 2-aminoadenine and 5-substituted pyrimidines together with a modified internucleoside linkage. In certain preferred embodiments, the 5-substituted pyrimidine is 5-methylcytosine. The oligonucleotides produced provide stronger hybridization to their target sequences. These oligonucleotides can be useful compounds, <i>inter alia</i> for diagnostic and therapeutic applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; A01N 43/04; A61K 31/70; C07H 21/00; C07H 21/02; C07H 21/04; C12P 19/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/113 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/113 (2013.01); C07H 21/00 (2013.01); C12N 2310/315 (2013.01); C12N 2310/321 (2013.01); C12N 2310/333 (2013.01); C12N 2310/334 (2013.01); C12N 2310/3341 (2013.01); C12N 2310/335 (2013.01); C12N 2310/346 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0102608 A1 20010111; AU 6071300 A 20010122; EP 1198592 A1 20020424; EP 1198592 A4 20020918

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-06-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040921

2002-09-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12Q 1/68 A, 7C 12P 19/34 B, 7C 07H 21/00 B, 7C 07H 21/02 B, 7C 07H 21/04 B, 7A 01N 43/04 B, 7A 61K 31/70 B

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020130;LT PAYMENT 20020130;LV PAYMENT 20020130;MK PAYMENT 20020130;RO PAYMENT 20020130;SI PAYMENT 20020130