Global Patent Index - EP 1198761 A4

EP 1198761 A4 2002-11-27 - METHOD FOR VISUALIZING INFORMATION IN A DATA WAREHOUSING ENVIRONMENT

Title (en)

METHOD FOR VISUALIZING INFORMATION IN A DATA WAREHOUSING ENVIRONMENT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN FÜR VISUELLE DARSTELLUNG DER INFORMATION IN EINER DATENLAGERUMGEBUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE VISUALISATION D'INFORMATIONS DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE DEPOT DE DONNEES

Publication

EP 1198761 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00906936 A

Priority

  • US 0001075 W
  • US 11601699 P
  • US 48338500 A
  • US 48318200 A
  • US 48338600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0042530A1] According to the invention, techniques for visualizing customer data (103) contained in databases (6), data marts and data warehouses (8). In an exemplary embodiment, the invention provides a method for graphically analyzing relationships in data (103) from one or more data sources of an enterprise. The method can be used with many popular visualization tools (21), such as a On Line Analytical Processing (OLAP) tools (2) and the like. The method is especially useful in conjunction with a meta-model (103) based technique for modeling the enterprise data. The enterprise is typically a business activity (21), but can also be other loci of human activity (10). Embodiments according to the invention can display data from a variety of sources in order to provide visual representations of data in a data warehousing environment (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30; G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 19/00 (2006.01); G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5832496 A 19981103 - ANAND TEJWANSH S [US], et al
  • [X] HOU J AND SHERMAN C: "Data Warehousing on HP3000 Using IMAGE/SQL-A New Alternative!", CONFERENCE HP WORLD'98, 2 August 1998 (1998-08-02) - 7 August 1998 (1998-08-07), San Diego, USA, XP002214273
  • [X] INFORMIX SOFTWARE INC.: "Explorer User's Guide. MetaCube ROLAP Option for Informix Dynamic Server", January 1998, INFORMIX PRESS, MENLO PARK, CA, XP002214274
  • [A] GUPTA V R: "An introduction to data warehousing", WHITE PAPER. SYSTEM SERVICES CORPORATION, August 1997 (1997-08-01), XP002204504
  • [A] JIM GRAY ET AL: "Data Cube: A Relational Aggregation Operator Generalizing Group-By, Cross-Tab, and Sub-Totals", JOURNAL OF DATA MINING AND KNOWLEDGE DISCOVERY, NORWELL, MA, US, 1997, pages 29 - 53, XP002901286, ISSN: 1384-5810
  • [A] VASSILIADIS P: "Modeling multidimensional databases, cubes and cube operations", SCIENTIFIC AND STATISTICAL DATABASE MANAGEMENT, 1998. PROCEEDINGS. TENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CAPRI, ITALY 1-3 JULY 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, 1 July 1998 (1998-07-01), pages 53 - 62, XP010291092, ISBN: 0-8186-8575-1
  • [A] CHAUDHURI S ET AL: "An overview of data warehousing and OLAP technology", SIGMOD RECORD, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, NEW YORK, US, vol. 26, no. 1, March 1997 (1997-03-01), pages 65 - 74, XP002115173
  • See also references of WO 0042530A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0042530 A1 20000720; AU 2851600 A 20000801; CN 1347529 A 20020501; EP 1198761 A1 20020424; EP 1198761 A4 20021127; JP 2003523547 A 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040803

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030704

2002-11-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 17/30 A, 7G 06F 17/60 B

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010814

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI