Global Patent Index - EP 1198973 B1

EP 1198973 B1 2003-06-18 - DEVICE FOR ADAPTING AT LEAST ONE ACOUSTIC HEARING AID

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR ADAPTING AT LEAST ONE ACOUSTIC HEARING AID

Title (de)

ANLAGE ZUR ANPASSUNG MINDESTENS EINES HÖRGERÄTES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR L'ADAPTATION D'AU MOINS UN APPAREIL DE CORRECTION AUDITIVE

Publication

EP 1198973 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932594 A

Priority

CH 9900355 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9949715A2] The invention relates to a unit for adapting acoustic hearing aids. Said unit comprises a first interface unit for outputting signals to an acoustic hearing aid (7), and comprises a second interface unit for receiving individual audio-stimulant reaction signals (9) via one and the same interface unit (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/00; A61B 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01); H04R 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/70 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9949715 A2 19991007; WO 9949715 A3 20000706; AU 4893799 A 19991018; CA 2380436 A1 19991007; CN 1359605 A 20020717; DE 59906049 D1 20030724; DK 1198973 T3 20031006; EP 1198973 A2 20020424; EP 1198973 B1 20030618; JP 2002541683 A 20021203; US 7006646 B1 20060228

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070731

2008-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-03-25 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2008-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-09-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060929

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060727

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2004-07-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040728

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040708

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-10-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906049 P 20030724

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011124

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE