Global Patent Index - EP 1199021 A3

EP 1199021 A3 2003-06-11 - Scraper for removing ice from surfaces

Title (en)

Scraper for removing ice from surfaces

Title (de)

Eiskratzvorrichtung zum Entfernen von Eis von einer Oberfläche

Title (fr)

Grattoir pour enlever la glace sur une surface

Publication

EP 1199021 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01125050 A

Priority

DE 10052281 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1199021A2] The ice scraper has a handle portion (12) containing batteries (13) and a working area (16) comprising a sharp cutting edge (18) and an embedded heating element (20) close to the edge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 1/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1199021 A2 20020424; EP 1199021 A3 20030611; DE 10052281 A1 20020516; DE 10052281 C2 20021010

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031212

2004-04-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI