Global Patent Index - EP 1199137 A3

EP 1199137 A3 2003-06-25 - Fastening device for screws on stripcarrier

Title (en)

Fastening device for screws on stripcarrier

Title (de)

Schraubvorrichtung für ein streifenförmiges Schraubenmagazin

Title (fr)

Dispositif de vissage pour vis montées sur une bande

Publication

EP 1199137 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 01810896 A

Priority

DE 10047455 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2002035900A1] A screw assembly for setting screws, disposed in a strip-shaped screw magazine, is connected detachably with a screw driver, which has a basic body (7) with a control curve (8), and a guiding element (1). The screw assembly has a carriage (11), a transporting pawl (14) and a carrier (17). The guiding element (1) can be shifted counter to the force of a spring opposite to setting direction of the screw driver and has a carrier seat (3), which extends perpendicularly to the setting direction of the screw. The carriage (11) has a control element, which can interact with a control surface (8), and can be shifted against the force of a spring along the carrier seat (3). A transporting pawl (14), which can be connected positively with the screw magazine, is disposed pivotally at the carriage (11). The carrier (17) is disposed removably at the carrier seat (3) and has a transporting channel (33), which accommodates and guides the strip-shaped screw magazine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/04 (2006.01); B25B 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/06 (2013.01); B25B 23/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

US 2002035900 A1 20020328; US 6431036 B1 20020813; DE 10047455 A1 20020411; DE 50114328 D1 20081030; EP 1199137 A2 20020424; EP 1199137 A3 20030625; EP 1199137 B1 20080917; JP 2002144248 A 20020521; JP 5123454 B2 20130123

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130917

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50114328

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130917

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120822

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120912

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090618

2008-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114328 P 20081030

2008-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031229

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI