Global Patent Index - EP 1199237 B1

EP 1199237 B1 2004-12-15 - Transmission for a rail vehicle

Title (en)

Transmission for a rail vehicle

Title (de)

Getriebe für Schienenfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Transmission pour véhicule ferroviaire

Publication

EP 1199237 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 01124748 A

Priority

DE 10052018 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1199237A1] The gearbox, for rail vehicles, has a summation gearing (22,22A) at each axle for the left and right (8) wheels, to overlay the drive (4) in the same direction of rotation as one wheel and the steering drive (6). The steering drive can impose a difference rotary speed on the wheels when the rail vehicle can be steered into a branch line. Each summation gearing has an input (20) from the drive motor and an input (32) from the steering drive, and a drive transmission (30) to the wheel. The second inputs (32,32A) are coupled together by a deflection stage (54,54A,56) so that they have the same rotary speed but in opposite directions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61C 15/14; B61F 3/16; B61F 5/38; B62D 11/16; F16H 48/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61C 15/14 (2006.01); B61F 3/16 (2006.01); B61F 5/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61C 15/14 (2013.01); B61F 3/16 (2013.01); B61F 5/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1199237 A1 20020424; EP 1199237 B1 20041215; DE 10052018 A1 20020425

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061010

- Year of fee payment: 6

2007-08-29 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070227

2007-08-29 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20070227

2006-10-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061012

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-10-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061011

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-11-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DEUTSCHES ZENTRUM FUER LUFT- UND RAUMFAHRT E.V.

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-09-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50104820 P 20050120

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-01-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-01-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011213

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI