Global Patent Index - EP 1199414 B1

EP 1199414 B1 2004-12-22 - Control device for flush tank discharge valves

Title (en)

Control device for flush tank discharge valves

Title (de)

Kontrollvorrichtung für Spülkastenventile

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle pour valves de chasse d'eau

Publication

EP 1199414 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 01124980 A

Priority

IT MI20000596 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1199414A2] A control device (1) for flush tank discharge valves, of the type in which a support (2) for the actuating members of a discharge valve is defined by a one-piece body made of polymer material, and has reversible fastening means (6) for connection to a member on a flush tank; the support (2) has a first, a second, and a third seat (11, 12, 13) for respective actuating members (15) connectable to the discharge valve; each seat (11, 12, 13) has connecting means (18, 19, 23, 24, 27, 28) by which a respective actuating member (15) clicks onto and pivots with respect to the support (2) ; and the support (2) is designed to receive from one to three actuating members (15), depending on the type of flush tank, with no alterations required, and with no need for supports specially designed for specific tanks, so that the control device (1) may be used on different types of flush tank. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 1/012; E03D 5/092

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/012 (2006.01); E03D 5/092 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 5/092 (2013.01); E03D 1/012 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1199414 A2 20020424; EP 1199414 A3 20021002; EP 1199414 B1 20041222; AU 780232 B2 20050310; AU 8143701 A 20020502; DE 60107918 D1 20050127; DE 60107918 T2 20060112; ES 2233551 T3 20050616; IL 146051 A 20061231; IL 146051 D0 20020725; IT 250196 Y1 20030724; IT MI20000596 U1 20020422

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071020

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071020

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071019

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-08-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20080606

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071019

2006-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061030

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-10-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061018

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-10-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061011

- Year of fee payment: 6

2006-09-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060913

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2233551 T3

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60107918 P 20050127

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-06-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-06-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20011106

- Countries: SI

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20011106

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 20011106